U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 26, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.