U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:16-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harling
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.