U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:18-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tillman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.