U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00132
  • Case Name: CURTIS et al v. EIDE BAILEY, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Vacate]
  • February 03, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 16, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.