U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00126
  • Case Name: Gebhardt v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Administrative Record]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.