U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Metzger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.