U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grandchamp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Dismissal - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • February 08, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.