U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Klein et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2023: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 03, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 10, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.