U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Welty v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Administrative Record]
  • April 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.