U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leatherberry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.