U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 21, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.