U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Medical Evaluation Report - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 16, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.