U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lingelbach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 08, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 26, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Suppress ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.