U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bessman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • July 05, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 05, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.