U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Reber v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.