U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.