U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BLUNT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 17, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement (Applicable Party) - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.