U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Flugge et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Settlement Conference - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Modify - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 21, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 21, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.