U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Fails v. Board of Probation & Parole et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.