U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Ascentium Capital, LLC v. Rostad et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pro Se Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Pro Se Answer]
  • December 13, 2022: [Pro Se PACER Approval]
  • December 13, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • December 08, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 14, 2022: [Vacate]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 01, 2022: [Counterclaim]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.