U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Antelope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.