U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00134
  • Case Name: ADAIR v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 16, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 17, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.