U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Strable v. RGIS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 27, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.