U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snyder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.