U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00005-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Dorado et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Probation/Supervised Release Transfer Notification]
  • January 05, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Remark - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.