U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Matta v. Cascade County Detention Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 01, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.