U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Campa v. Yellowstone County Detention Facility Nurse Staff
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Strike - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • February 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 04, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.