U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Clervrain et al. v. Daines et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 06, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • February 06, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Pro Se Amended Complaint - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 30, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • December 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.