U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Anderson et al v. Boyne USA, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Objection - MT]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2024: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 14, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 13, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • November 22, 2024: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Errata - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2023: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 31, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 03, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.