U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Marble et al v. Everly
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Report of Mediation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Vacate]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • May 18, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 03, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 27, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 13, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 15, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • February 13, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 20, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 20, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • January 07, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 07, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.