U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toulouse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Staying Case - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.