U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodenlegs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.