U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Mallo v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Pro Se Response to Motion - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 01, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Remand]
  • November 30, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 07, 2022: [Pro Se Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Administrative Record]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [Pro Se Motion for Extension - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • January 03, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 03, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.