U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Lozeau v. Briney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 11, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.