U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Dwyer et al v. GK Development, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 05, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.