U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Retzer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.