U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.