U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.