U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whaley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Letter - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.