U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carmody
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.