U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schmidt et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.