U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Mages et al v. Picard Corporation, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • April 06, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 10, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 06, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.