U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Derbyshire
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.