U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 31, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.