U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gohde
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Warrant ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Warrant ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2022: [Vacate]
  • February 24, 2022: [Stay - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Quash ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.