U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.