U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Cole v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 10, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 10, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.