U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Widdicombe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Vacate]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2022: [Letter - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.