U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Luikens v. BMC West
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Appear]
  • April 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 10, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.