U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:14-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 06, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 10, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.